General of Flak Troops of the Army and Inspector of Army Flak 15.1-1.8.44
His medal bar and ribbon bars.
I believe I am reliably informed by Rick and Glenn of the following:
Wilhelm Weidinger
Born 12 September 1889 Schmalkalden
Army 7 September 1909 to 31 December 1944
Cadet in Foot Artillery Regiment 13 but commissioned in the newly raised Foot Artillery Regiment 16,then posted to the Military Technical Academy 1913/14
Leutnant 27.1.11 vorpatentiert to 29.1.09 Nn
Oberleutnant 22.3.15 D50d
Major 1.3.31 (4)
Oberstleutnant 1.7.34
Oberst 1.10.36 #6
Generalmajor 1.10.40
Generalleutnant 1 October 1941 #6
Commander of 9th Battery, III Battalion, Artillery Regiment 3 in 1924
On staff of Artillery Regiment 5 1928
In 1932 he was on the staff of the Heers-Waffenamt (WaA) in the ballistics and munitions department - Ballistische-und Munitionsabteilung (Wa Prw 1)
He commanded Beobachtungs-Abteilung 4 at Landsberg (Lech) from 1 May 1933 to 30 September 1934 and Artillerie Regiment 5 at Ulm from 6 Oct 1936 to 1 Feb 1937
Section Chief (Abteilungs-Chef) of OKH/HWA "Wa Pruf 8"--Abteilung for Optik, Messwesen und Heereswetterdienst from 1 October 1937
Arko 18 15.7.40
Inspector of Army Flak on staff of the OKH 1.2.41
General of Flak Troops of the Army and Inspector of Army Flak 15.1 to 1.8.44
Died 14 May 1967.
His medal bar and ribbon bars.
I believe I am reliably informed by Rick and Glenn of the following:
Wilhelm Weidinger
Born 12 September 1889 Schmalkalden
Army 7 September 1909 to 31 December 1944
Cadet in Foot Artillery Regiment 13 but commissioned in the newly raised Foot Artillery Regiment 16,then posted to the Military Technical Academy 1913/14
Leutnant 27.1.11 vorpatentiert to 29.1.09 Nn
Oberleutnant 22.3.15 D50d
Major 1.3.31 (4)
Oberstleutnant 1.7.34
Oberst 1.10.36 #6
Generalmajor 1.10.40
Generalleutnant 1 October 1941 #6
Commander of 9th Battery, III Battalion, Artillery Regiment 3 in 1924
On staff of Artillery Regiment 5 1928
In 1932 he was on the staff of the Heers-Waffenamt (WaA) in the ballistics and munitions department - Ballistische-und Munitionsabteilung (Wa Prw 1)
He commanded Beobachtungs-Abteilung 4 at Landsberg (Lech) from 1 May 1933 to 30 September 1934 and Artillerie Regiment 5 at Ulm from 6 Oct 1936 to 1 Feb 1937
Section Chief (Abteilungs-Chef) of OKH/HWA "Wa Pruf 8"--Abteilung for Optik, Messwesen und Heereswetterdienst from 1 October 1937
Arko 18 15.7.40
Inspector of Army Flak on staff of the OKH 1.2.41
General of Flak Troops of the Army and Inspector of Army Flak 15.1 to 1.8.44
Died 14 May 1967.
Comment